BARRACUDA SWIMMING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We assist the disabled to be safe in water. We teach using the Halliwick method. It encourages independence and self reliance. We further develop those skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 May 1978: Standard registration
- BARRACUDE SWIMMING CLUB (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Renos Georgiou | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claudia McCarthy | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Pressney | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARIE SCALES | Trustee | 01 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £953 | £4.47k | £193 | £593 | £1.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.42k | £388 | £310 | £204 | £394 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2024 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 January 2021 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON THE 15TH MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND TEACH THE ART OF SWIMMING AMONG THE DISABLED.
Area of benefit
HERTSMERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 ABERDALE GARDENS
POTTERS BAR
EN6 2JN
- Phone:
- 01707 643198
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window