SCOTTISH TERRIER EMERGENCY CARE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide care in the form of temporary homes for Scottish Terriers & any other breed from the same household or kennel which have need of such care by reason of neglect or ill-treatment or where owners of such dogs are no longer able to care for them properly and to assist in the provision of new homes for these dogs where they may be properly cared for.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 May 1978: Standard registration
- STECS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ekkehard Kugler | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan Rose | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Gaskell | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mabon | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Core | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN SIMMS | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Mabon | Trustee | 07 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Marchbank | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.18k | £110.14k | £193.48k | £54.03k | £227.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.15k | £68.80k | £65.01k | £114.91k | £152.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JULY 1976 AS AMENDED ON 7 MARCH 1978, 20 MARCH 1982, 12 OCTOBER 2008 AND 10 MAY 2009. AS AMENDED ON 26/04/2015 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 2017 as amended on 02 Apr 2022 as amended on 15 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
A CANINE WELFARE ORGANISATION PROVIDING SPECIFICALLY FOR THE CARE OF SCOTTISH TERRIERS IN NEED OF NEW HOMES OR OF SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE AS MAY BE DEEMED APPROPRIATE. IT SHALL ALSO BE PERMISSIBLE TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE DETERMINED ON A DISCRETIONARY BASIS, TO CANINES DEEMED TO BE OF SCOTTISH TERRIER TYPE IN CASES WHERE THAT BREED STATUS IS NOT IMMEDIATELY APPARENT. TO PROVIDE CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO OTHER CANINES FROM THE SAME HOME ENVIRONMENT AS ANY SCOTTISH TERRIER RECEIVING ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lodge
Hoghton
PRESTON
PR5 0SH
- Phone:
- 01772601169
- Email:
- secretary@stecs.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window