Accounts and annual returns CLEVEDON NAILSEA AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE NO 381

Charity Number: 275679
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 March 2021 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required