CLEVEDON NAILSEA AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE NO 381
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising from social events for distribution to local charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Somerset
Governance
- 22 May 1978: Standard registration
- 20 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- 20 January 2025: Funds transferred to 287627 LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF CLEVEDON HOSPITAL
- CLEVEDON AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE NO 381 (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1978
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH QUALIFIED CHARITY OR SUCH QUALIFIED CHARITIES AND IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH SHARES AND PROPORTIONS BETWEEN THEM AND GENERALLY IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DIRECTED SO TO PAY OR APPLY BY THE TABLE COUNCIL OF THE ROUND TABLE.
Area of benefit
CLEVEDON AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window