ENFIELD AND DISTRICT VETERAN VEHICLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the permanent preservation of vehicles of any type being old and of historic interest or scientific importance and to educate the public in the history of transport and the technical details, engineering and performance of such vehicles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Enfield
Governance
- 18 April 1978: Standard registration
- WHITEWEBBS MUSEUM (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH OSWICK | Chair | 01 November 2007 |
|
|
||||
June Bayer | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CLINTON | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CROOKS | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER WATT | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.42k | £63.59k | £59.02k | £238.54k | £231.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.59k | £82.73k | £57.48k | £160.02k | £179.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £11.13k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 28 September 2020 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH APRIL 1978 as amended on 19 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD, OF VEHICLES OF AN TYPE BEING OLD AND OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE PARTICULAR VEHICLES OF SPECIAL MERIT AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF TRANSPORT AND THE TECHNICAL DETAILS, ENGINEERING AND PERFORMANCE OF SUCH VEHICLES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Whitewebbs Museum Of Transport
Whitewebbs Road
ENFIELD
Middlesex
EN2 9HW
- Phone:
- 02083671898
- Email:
- office@whitewebbsmuseum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window