CANVEY ISLAND HISTORICAL AND CONSERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Heritage Centre operates in the Castle point are.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 05 June 1978: Standard registration
- THE HERITAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Don Mclean | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ward | Trustee | 25 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY DE-BOISE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.51k | £4.51k | £2.75k | £2.95k | £4.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.78k | £2.78k | £7.94k | £3.73k | £4.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
1) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION PROTECTION DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST.
Area of benefit
CASTLE POINT
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 Hindles Road
CANVEY ISLAND
SS8 8HT
- Phone:
- 01268694317
- Email:
- rosemaryanded31@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window