FALMOUTH AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 275710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN AGRICULTURE, HOME CRAFTS, COUNTRY LIFE AND RELATED SUBJECTS. AND B) IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £8,428
Total expenditure: £5,706

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dan Seabourne Chair 01 October 2023
None on record
Brodie Burley Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Isabella Kenyon Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.98k £1.91k £5.51k £4.73k £8.43k
Total expenditure £5.86k £12 £5.76k £5.39k £5.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 05 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 August 2022 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cornwall Young Farmers Clubs
Royal Cornwall Showground
Whitecross
Wadebridge
PL27 7JE
Phone:
01208 893080
Website:

No information available