ST COLUMB YOUNG FARMERS CLUB

Charity number: 275712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

A) To advance the education of young members of the public in agriculture, home crafts, country life and related subjects. And B) In the interest of social welfare to provide and promote the provision of facilities for recreation and leisure.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £21,199
Total expenditure: £27,572

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cornwall

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 June 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST COLUMB YFC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Goodwin Chair 01 October 2023
None on record
Benjamin Bullen Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record
Lauren Pilsworth Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £13.37k £2.01k £21.49k £28.95k £21.20k
Total expenditure £14.80k £1.60k £19.07k £22.91k £27.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 14 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 14 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 July 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 15 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
YFC OFFICE
CAERHAYES SUITE
PAVILLION CENTRE
SHOWGROUND
WADEBRIDGE
CORNWALL
Phone:
01208893080
Website:

No information available