THE FIRST HERNE BAY OVER 60'S CLUB

Charity number: 275725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a meeting place and to promote the welfare of all Herne Bay residents who are over 60 years of age.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £28,815
Total expenditure: £31,957

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 July 1978: Standard registration
  • 12 May 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROBERT MICHAEL HANNAFORD Chair 01 April 2016
None on record
PAMLA PETTIFER Trustee 13 December 2011
None on record
JOYCE HANNAFORD Trustee 18 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £32.47k £7.29k £16.98k £22.49k £28.82k
Total expenditure £25.05k £14.08k £28.00k £30.00k £31.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 06 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 13 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 13 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 24 NOV. 1970
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE HERNE BAY OVER 60'S CLUB AT WILLIAM STREET, HERNE BAY, KENT.
Area of benefit
HERNE BAY
Registration history
  • 07 July 1978 : Standard registration
  • 12 May 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
FIRST HERNE BAY OVER 60S CLUB
PETTMAN HOUSE
HANOVER SQUARE
HERNE BAY
CT6 5NY
Phone:
01227 361833
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available