CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST MANSE

Charity number: 275730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of accommodation, mainly for church staff.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,533
Total expenditure: £27,499

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BROOKINGS TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Andrew Patrick Trustee 03 June 2024
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Rathika Chinnadurai Trustee 03 June 2024
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Andrew James Wallace Trustee 22 May 2023
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Reuben Stuart Willcocks Trustee 22 May 2023
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Mark Bailey Trustee 29 May 2022
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Andrew Raymond Law Trustee 23 May 2022
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
David Mark Fox Trustee 23 May 2022
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Charles Christopher Medlock Trustee 07 June 2021
CREECH ST MICHAEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Received: On time
Benjamin Cavaghan Trustee 20 May 2019
None on record
Jane Anne Warden Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Rev Matthew Bradley Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Mig Partridge Trustee 17 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.63k £17.54k £18.89k £19.99k £20.53k
Total expenditure £19.49k £17.51k £18.88k £19.95k £27.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST MICHAELS ROAD
ZION BAPTIST CHURCH
CREECH ST. MICHAEL
TAUNTON
TA3 5QQ
Phone:
01823443692
Website:

No information available