CITY OF LONDON SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SCC is a voluntary youth organisation which aims to: a. Help young people towards responsible adulthood. b. Encourage valuable personal attributes and high standards of conduct, using a nautical theme based upon the traditions and customs of the Royal Navy. The Unit is very fortunate to meet on HMS Belfast. We strive to build and maintain relationships with various bodies within the City.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- City Of London
- City Of Westminster
- Islington
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 08 May 1978: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 December 2009: Standard registration
- CITY OF LONDON SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- CITY OF LONDON UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Mark Wells | Chair | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Thomas Daniel Still | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Arron Charlton McDonald | Trustee | 10 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Louise Ann Thompson | Trustee | 28 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Alexander Constantine Jonesco | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Chloe Andrews-Jones | Trustee | 04 April 2010 |
|
|||||||
JONATHAN STEER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.59k | £7.54k | £11.61k | £22.16k | £23.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.76k | £7.09k | £11.11k | £15.47k | £18.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
CITY OF LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Red House
West Tofts Road
Lynford
Norfolk
IP26 5EN
- Phone:
- 020 7407 2205
- Email:
- cityoflondonscc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window