THE EAST SURREY TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of fortnightly readings of local news to those who are Registered Blind or Partially Sighted. Provided on digitally recorded memory sticks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 June 1978: Standard registration
- 23 September 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE EAST SURREY TALKING NEWSPAPER (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.23k | £2.19k | £1.38k | £1.43k | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.37k | £2.44k | £2.43k | £1.03k | £262 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED ON THE 14TH MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND, OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, LIVING IN, OR IN THE VICINITY OF THE BOROUGH OF REIGATE AND BANSTEAD, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
REIGATE AND BANSTEAD AND VICINITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window