ADAMSON COLLECTION TRUST

Charity number: 275834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promotion and funding of Art therapy

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £1,215
Total expenditure: £1,211

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 May 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • ADAMSON COLLECTION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Anne Ruane Chair 14 January 2024
None on record
VALERIE HUET Trustee 21 November 2017
None on record
Richard Charles Morley Trustee 23 March 2015
None on record
Dr DAVID O'FLYNN Trustee 02 October 1997
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.09k £3.45k £2.39k £2.68k £1.22k
Total expenditure £5.58k £2.28k £2.94k £3.03k £1.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 06 August 2024 183 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 08 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lambeth Hospital
108 Landor Road
LONDON
SW9 9NU
Phone:
02032286329