THE BRITISH SUB AQUA JUBILEE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the advancement of underwater exploration, discovery of safety health and science and for other kindred purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THOMAS GAVIN ANTHONY | Chair |
|
||||||
Alison Mayor | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Oliver Firth | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr KEN COLLINS BSC PHD PGCE | Trustee | 24 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cdr MARTIN MARKS OBE BSc | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr TONY MARSHALL | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr JOHN DAVID KING | Trustee | 18 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
GARRY MOMBER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR NICHOLAS COIT FLEMMING OBE MA PHD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £3.65k | £4.07k | £2.17k | £10.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.79k | £3.79k | £3.35k | £5.50k | £2.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED THE ORD DAY OF MAY 1978
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION, ENCOURAGEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF UNDERWATER AND MARINE STUDY, RESEARCH AND EXPLORATION WITH REFERENCE TO THE MARINE AND RELATED SCIENCES, UNDERWATER ARCHAEOLOGY, THE CONSERVATION OF THE UNDERWATER ENVIRONMENT, THE LIFE THERIN AND ALL ITS RESOURCES FOR THE BENEFIT OF HUMAN LIFE AND HEALTH AND HUMAN SURVIVAL, SAFETY, HEALTH AND MOVEMENT UNDERWATER, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS THEREOF AND THE ESTABLISHMENT OF PERMANENT LIBRARY AND INSTITUTE FOR THE PRESERVATION AND STUDY OF HISTORICAL, TECHNICAL AND OTHER RECORD RELATING TO UNDERWATER SCIENCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 SOLENT WAY
GOSPORT
PO12 2NS
- Phone:
- 023 9252 3378
- Email:
- bsajt@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window