BRITISH-ARAB EXCHANGES (BAX)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 June 1978: Standard registration
- 01 December 2004: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 December 2004: Funds transferred to 1105850 BRITISH-ARAB EXCHANGES
- BRITISH-ARAB UNIVERSITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2004 | 16 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4TH MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 6TH OCTOBER 1983 AND 2 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, DEVELOP, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN THE EDUCATION OF CITIZENS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE SCIENCE, ART, LITERATURE, MUSIC, HISTORY, ECONOMICS, PHILOSOPHY, CULTURE, RELIGION, WAY OF LIFE AND OTHER RECOGNISED SUBJECTS OF ACADEMIC STUDY OF ARAB AND OTHER ISLAMIC COUNTRIES. SEE CONSTITUTION FOR FURTHER DETAILS OF OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window