Governing document ODYSSEY TRUST UK
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH MAY 1978 AS AMENDED 28TH SEPTEMBER 2001 AND DECEMBER 10TH 2002 AS AMENDED 7TH DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 21 MARCH 2006 AS AMENDED 27 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
1. TREATMENT AND CARE OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM DEPENDENCE UPON OR ADDICTION TO DRUGS. 2. THE REHABILITATION OF THOSE RELIEVED FROM DEPENDENCE UPON OR ADDICTION TO DRUGS. 3. THE PRESERVATION AND SAFEGUARDING OF THE HEALTH OF PERSONS DEPENDENT ON DRUGS.
Area of benefit
ISLINGTON AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.