BRACKLEY DARBY AND JOAN CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold weekly meetings, play bingo, have talks, slide shows, beetle drives, go on pub lunches & a seaside trip in the Summer. We have a weekly raqffle, and a yearly Christmas lunch. We also have a mothers day service & carol service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 June 1978: Standard registration
- 27 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.35k | £8.32k | £3.37k | £2.76k | £2.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.96k | £7.78k | £3.26k | £3.63k | £3.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 December 2017 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 06 June 2016 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 09 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE TOWN OF BRACKLEY AND ADJOINING VILLAGES.
Area of benefit
BRACKLEY AND ADJOINING VILLAGES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window