OXFORDSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A- To promote and advance the study of family history and genealogy with particular reference to the county of Oxfordshire. B- To locate, preserve, publish where applicable and make available relevant documents and archival material. C- Hold regular meetings, produce three journals per year and attend other societies and organisations fairs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 June 1978: Standard registration
- OFHS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles George Arthur Whitehead | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kathyrn Wait | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Louise Jones | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Ramon | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Charles Henry Eldridge | Trustee | 06 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Christine Trueman | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Poile | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mattheus | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CRAMER | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUE HONORE | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM DAVID AUSTEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.39k | £44.08k | £54.62k | £55.33k | £56.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.80k | £47.47k | £39.07k | £48.00k | £45.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAR 1978 AS AMENDED ON 15 MAY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 28 OCT 1996 AS AMENDED ON 26 OCT 1998 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 25 JUN 2018 as amended on 24 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY PRIMARILY WITHIN THE POST-1974 COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE B. TO COLLECT, INDEX, CO-ORDINATE, PUBLISH AND MAKE ACCESSIBLE IN THE INTERESTS OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY ANY RELEVANT DOCUMENT OR RECORDS RELATING TO THE COUNTY C. TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION OF SUCH DOCUMENTS OR RECORDS D. TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY E. TO ASSIST EDUCATIONALLY BY LECTURES OR OTHERWISE IN RECORD RESEARCH F. TO CO-OPERATE WITH FAMILY HISTORY AND OTHER SOCIETIES WITH SIMILAR INTERESTS.
Area of benefit
PRIMARILY WITHIN THE POST-1974 COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
OXFORDSHIRE RECORDS OFFICE
ST. LUKES CHURCH
TEMPLE ROAD
OXFORD
OX4 2HT
- Phone:
- 01865358151
- Email:
- secretary@ofhs.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window