THE BRITISH NUMISMATIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 275906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Society is established for the benefit of the public through the encouragement and promotion of numismatic science, and particularly through the study of the coins, medals and tokens of the peoples of the British Isles and Commonwealth and the United States of America, and of such territories as may at any time be, or have been, subject to their jurisdiction.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £73,626
Total expenditure: £71,536

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 1979: Standard registration
  • 17 February 2000: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kevin Clancy Trustee 25 November 2024
THE UK NUMISMATIC TRUST
Received: On time
Wendy Scott Trustee 25 November 2024
LEICESTERSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
Dr Alice Blackwell Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Chris Barker Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Richard Ambrose Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Timothy Cook Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
Lindsay Hardcastle Trustee 25 November 2024
None on record
David Kirk Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Joshua Cattermole Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Laura Burnett Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
Robert Hoge Trustee 22 November 2022
None on record
DAVID YOUNG Trustee 27 November 2018
None on record
Robert Page Trustee 27 November 2017
None on record
William Alexander MacKay Trustee 27 November 2017
None on record
Bradley Scott Shepherd Trustee 27 November 2017
THE ROYAL NUMISMATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
DR ELINA MARY SCREEN Trustee 22 November 2016
None on record
PETER JOHN PRESTON-MORLEY Trustee
None on record
HUGH EDMUND PAGAN Trustee
None on record
DR DAVID WILMER DYKES Trustee
THE UK NUMISMATIC TRUST
Received: On time
Dr MARTIN ROBERT ALLEN Trustee
CAMBRIDGE ANTIQUARIAN SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £128.32k £28.63k £35.99k £261.39k £73.63k
Total expenditure £39.38k £39.83k £22.43k £64.85k £71.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES ADOPTED 25 MAY 1910
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A GOLD MEDAL TO BE AWARDED TRIANNUALLY TO THE MEMBER OF THE SOCIETY WHOSE PAPER OR PAPERS APPEARING IN THE SOCIETY'S PUBLICATIONS SHALL RECEIVE THE HIGHEST NUMBER OF VOTES FROM THE MEMBERS, AS BEING THE BEST IN THE INTERESTS OF NUMISMATIC SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 16 May 1979 : Standard registration
  • 17 February 2000 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
89 GILLARDS CLOSE
ROCKWELL GREEN
WELLINGTON
TA21 9DX
Phone:
01823665641