SAINT FRANCIS HOSPICE

Charity number: 275913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Hospice aims to provide timely holistic care. This care may be provided to address needs which are; physical, emotional, social (Inclusive of environmental and diversity challenges people face) and spiritual in order to enhance the quality of life of each individual patient and those important to them.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex
  • Isles Of Scilly
  • Lancashire
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 2007: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ST FRANCIS HOSPICE (Previous name)
  • ST FRANCIS HOSPICE LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Edwards Chair 13 August 2024
None on record
Mimi Lau-Smith Trustee 07 October 2024
None on record
Amanda Casson-Webb Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
James Martin Pepper Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Malcolm John Hines Trustee 06 November 2023
None on record
Esther Claire Marshall Trustee 22 August 2023
None on record
Angela Sharma Trustee 21 August 2023
None on record
Anne Bender Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
Ian MacDonald Gunn Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Amanda Camille Hallums Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record
Paul Gwinn Trustee 01 April 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.29m £12.56m £11.77m £11.88m £12.39m
Total expenditure £11.11m £10.65m £10.76m £11.61m £11.75m
Income from government contracts N/A £3.46m £3.73m £3.84m £3.85m
Income from government grants £320.00k £2.64m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.20m £7.96m £5.69m £5.29m £5.33m
Income - Other trading activities £2.39m £557.00k £0 £2.26m £2.64m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £3.78m £1.94m £3.84m £3.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £205.00k £135.00k £162.00k £275.00k £453.00k
Income - Other £3.50m £118.00k £116.00k £213.00k £121.00k
Income - Legacies £2.73m £2.03m £1.79m £1.91m £2.41m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.82m £7.68m £7.55m £8.22m £8.32m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.48m £2.96m £3.21m £3.39m £3.43m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £101.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.80m £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £2.79m £2.67m £2.58m £2.54m £2.45m
Long-term investments £4.92m £6.40m £6.76m £6.46m £7.52m
Other assets £8.60m £10.25m £11.51m £11.62m £11.69m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £585.00k £828.00k £1.07m £1.01m £975.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 26 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 7 DECEMBER 1983 AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 28 DECEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES ARE LIKELY TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL CARE AND SCIENCE THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF THE HOSPICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON
Registration history
  • 25 June 2007 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
SAINT FRANCIS HOSPICE
THE HALL
BROXHILL ROAD
HAVERING-ATTE-BOWER
ROMFORD
RM4 1QH
Phone:
01708753319