FRIENDS OF COUNTESS MOUNTBATTEN HOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve patients and otherwise support the work of Countess Mountbatten House, offering palliative care, pain relief and support for the terminally ill. Countess Mountbatten Hospice Charity Limited (CMHC-No.1123304) was incorporated in 2008 to replace the Friends charity. All the assets and liabilities of Friends transferred to CMHC on 1 April 2008 with permission from the Charity Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 30 June 1978: Standard registration
- 15 February 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 15 February 2013: Funds transferred to 1123304 MOUNTBATTEN HAMPSHIRE LIMITED
- FRIENDS OF COUNTESS MOUNTBATTEN HOUSE (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF COUNTESS MOUNTBATTEN HOUSE HOSPITAL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.19m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.18m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £663.37k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £398.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £118.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £9.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £467.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £997.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £860.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 22 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 19 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 17 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 15 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 20 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE COUNTESS MOUNTBATTEN HOUSE, AND THEIR CARERS, WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window