Seven Dials Playhouse Limited


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
- The Charity Commission has opened an inquiry Open in new window into the charity
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objective of the company is to promote and assist education and the Arts for public benefit by research, discussions and seminars, vocational training, the provision of development facilities related to the Arts in general and especially the theatre and with the production of educational plays; and the provision of professional development and training for Actors via a trading subsidiary.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 June 1978: Standard registration
- Seven Dials Playhouse Ltd (Working name)
- Seven Dials Playhouse (Previous name)
- THE ACTORS CENTRE (Previous name)
- THE ACTORS PROFESSIONAL CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- TRISTAN BATES THEATRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irfan Mughal | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reece McMahon | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Boxall | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Wilkes | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faye Castelow | Trustee | 19 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ian Douglas Ross Nicol | Trustee | 18 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SUBRAMANIAM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £822.59k | £687.58k | £686.07k | £417.04k | £430.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £790.72k | £755.94k | £452.99k | £701.25k | £1.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £344.56k | £225.70k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £73.73k | £31.31k | £407.54k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £501.85k | £512.97k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £247.00k | £143.30k | £99.59k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £178.95k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £34.00k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £786.58k | £752.35k | £452.99k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £4.14k | £3.59k | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 140 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 June 2023 | 140 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1978 as amended on 02 Nov 2021 as amended on 20 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS AND BY RESEARCH LECTURES DISCUSSIONS AND SEMINARS, VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND THE PROVISION OF RESEARCH FACILITIES RELATED TO THE ARTS IN GENERAL AND INTER ALIA THE ART OF THE THEATRE AND BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Seven Dials Playhouse
1A Tower Street
London
London
WC2H 9NP
- Phone:
- 02038416606
- Website:
-
WWW.SEVENDIALSPLAYHOUSE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window