FULL GOSPEL BUSINESSMEN UK & IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold regular meetings throughout the UK and Ireland usually with a meal, which are open to members of the public we share 'real life stories' about what a difference it makes having Jesus in our lives. We bring together men and women of all Christian backgrounds and occupations, meeting in hotels, restaurants and the marketplace. We offer support to the sick and distressed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 June 1978: Standard registration
- FGB (Working name)
- FGB UK (Working name)
- FGBMFI (Working name)
- FGBMFI (UK & IRELAND) (Working name)
- FGBMFI(UK) (Working name)
- FULL GOSPEL BUSINESSMEN'S FELLOWSHIP (UK & IRELAND) (Working name)
- BUSINESS MEN'S FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL (UK) (Previous name)
- FULL GOSPEL BUSINESS MEN'S FELLOWSHIP INTERNATIONAL (UK) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR BENDRIEN | Chair |
|
||||||||
Dr Issac Osemwegie Ohomba | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Ashburner | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Bernard Galopin | Trustee | 05 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Harold Magee | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Barrie Lawrence | Trustee | 02 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
JACK POMFRET | Trustee | 27 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID KENNETH JOHN RILEY | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD CORDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PETER HENRY SPRECKLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JACOB JOHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
GEOFFREY HARESCEUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
STUART CRIPPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.74k | £79.39k | £54.70k | £50.83k | £61.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.02k | £77.21k | £74.97k | £50.25k | £64.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 04/03/1978 AS AMENDED ON 06/10/1982 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 08/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 30 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN, IN THE UK AND IRELAND AND OVERSEAS, THE TEACHING AND PURPOSES OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT RESTRICTING OR LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE SPREADING OF THE GOSPEL AMONG MEN OF BUSINESS AND OTHERS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Full Gospel Businessmens Fellowship
UK & Ireland
PO BOX 11
KNUTSFORD
WA16 6QP
- Phone:
- 01565632667
- Email:
- office@fgbuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window