PROVINCE OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE CHARITY FOR CARE AND RELIEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dispensation of funds for the benefit of poor and distressed Masons and their dependants of the Province of Cambridgeshire, Masonic charities and other charitable institutions,societies or objects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 28 June 1978: Standard registration
- THE PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILL DASTUR | Chair |
|
||||||
Steven Victor Napier | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Mark Badcock | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edwin Brown | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Lambert | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Alan John Delaune | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Mervyn Alexander Sinclair | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Jeffrey Mader | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Rowney | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
George Martin Brennan | Trustee | 27 May 2015 |
|
|||||
DAVID MCKAY BLAIR | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.15k | £17.13k | £18.26k | £24.62k | £20.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.92k | £25.52k | £31.17k | £23.47k | £42.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23RD JANUARY 1932
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF SUCH DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS, THEIR WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES AND OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE SAID PROVINCIAL GRAND LODGE OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE SHALL IN A DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6A The Butts
Soham
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB7 5AN
- Phone:
- 07715 118534
- Email:
- treasurer@pglcambs.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window