THE NORTH DEVON TALKING NEWSPAPER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of weekly digital memory sticks of news for the blind
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 October 1978: Standard registration
- TALKING NEWSPAPERS FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Street Mr | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
DEAN WARMINGTON | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derrick Rouault | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.74k | £886 | £20.16k | £532 | £729 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80k | £1.02k | £1.82k | £1.22k | £2.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 October 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON THE 4TH SEPTEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE BLIND AND VISUALLY HANDICAPPED (WHETHER REGISTERED BLIND OR NOT) BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES.
Area of benefit
HARTLAND, HOLSWORTHY, SOUTH MOLTON AND LYNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Old Farm Court
Lake
Tawstock
BARNSTAPLE
Devon
EX31 3HT
- Phone:
- 07971830881
- Email:
- DEANMWARMINGTON@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window