Trustees THE PUG DOG WELFARE & RESCUE ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 276067

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay Jayne Greene RGN BSc MA | Chair | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anne McDonald | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robin Green | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Brown | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Dean | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Parke | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.