THE LILIAN STONE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of poverty of Shipton Gorge residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Dorset
Governance
- 12 July 1978: Standard registration
- THE LILLIAN STONE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Puttock | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hewlett | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Andrew Thimont | Trustee | 22 September 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £363 | £1.07k | £0 | £12 | £48 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 March 2024 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 12TH FEBRUARY 1936
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF SHIPTON GORGE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. MARTINS SHIPTON GORGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masons Cottage
Brook Street
Shipton Gorge
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 4NA
- Phone:
- 01308897574
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window