SOUTHAMPTON ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holds meetings with guest speakers on archaelogical subjects. Arranges study days on particular periods of history and outings to places of archaelogical importance & interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Southampton City
Governance
- 05 July 1978: Standard registration
- S C M A S (Working name)
- SOUTHAMPTON CITY MUSEUMS ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Langran | Chair | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Davies | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Kesby | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN DOWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH VERONICA JANE HANNA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £990 | £1.93k | £2.39k | £2.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £1.04k | £1.25k | £2.33k | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 01 March 2024 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH MAY 1978 AS AMENDED ON 10 MAY 2017 as amended on 11 May 2021 as amended on 11 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ALL FORMS AND BRANCHES OF ARCHAEOLOGICAL RESEARCH WITHIN THE SOUTHAMPTON DISTRICT AND, WHERE RELEVANT, IN CO-OPERATION WITH KINDRED SOCIETIES, IN ADJACENT DISTRICTS. IT SALL ALSO ENCOURAGE AN INTEREST IN ARCHAEOLOGY BY ISSUING PUBLICATION AND ALSO BY ARRANGING LECTURES, EXCURSIONS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES, ALL OF WHICH SHALL BE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, AND THE SOCIETY SHALL DISSEMINATE ITS RESULTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Arlott Court
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 2RZ
- Phone:
- 02380 221587
- Email:
- suedavies64@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
Southamptonarchaeology.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window