ST ALBANS MUSICAL MUSEUM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society administers St Albans Organ Theatre which houses a permanent working exhibition of mechanical musical instruements and theatre pipe organs. It is open to the public one Sunday per month from 2 - 4.30pm and features a live musical performance with a full descriptive commentary. Organised groups are welcome at other times by arrangement. Regular theatre organ concerts are also held.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 August 1978: Standard registration
- ST ALBANS ORGAN THEATRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEN SLOW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Peter Barham | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rose Marie Allen | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES CRAIG | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET DORIS PEACHEY | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Earl | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH CHARLES PINNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERIC ALBERT PEACHEY F.C.I.S. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JAMES ALLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.78k | £35.90k | £30.86k | £19.04k | £23.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.27k | £19.97k | £19.67k | £34.47k | £31.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £22.57k | £2.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 MARCH 1978
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE GENERAL PUBLIC'S APPRECIATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF THE ART, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY RELATING TO THE MANUFACTURE OPERATION AND PERFORMANCE OF MECHANICAL MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND THEATRE AND CINEMA ORGANS AND SIMILAR INSTRUMENTS. (II) TO ACQUIRE AND EXHIBIT TO THE PUBLIC SUCH MECHANICAL MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS AND ORGANS AS ARE OF HISTORICAL MUSICAL AND SCIENTIFIC VALUE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
IN AND NEAR ST ALBANS HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Heather Mead
Edlesborough
Dunstable
LU6 2HJ
- Phone:
- 01525221358
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window