ASPECT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide financial support for a variety of general charitable purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 July 1978: Standard registration
- THE R M AND L R GORE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Simeon Gore | Trustee | 20 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
DIANA MAE GORE | Trustee | 04 September 1990 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MICHAEL GORE | Trustee | 21 May 1978 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.45k | £24.01k | £26.92k | £32.36k | £31.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.39k | £2.35k | £2.18k | £26.88k | £25.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2022
(These accounts |
04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 MAY 1978 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 KEATS GROVE
LONDON
NW3 2RS
- Phone:
- 07770478989
- Email:
- robert@igore.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window