HASTINGS TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RECORDED MATERIAL IN THE FORM OF LOCAL NEWS AND 'MAGAZINE' TO REGISTERED BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS AND TO INCLUDE PERSONS WITH READING DIFFICULTIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 17 August 1978: Standard registration
- 22 September 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1102016 HASTINGS AND ROTHER VOLUNTARY ASSOCIATION FOR THE ...
- H T N A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140 | £1.29k | £1.18k | £1.10k | £112 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.68k | £1.36k | £9.45k | £3.05k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 06 March 2020 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 22 APRIL 1987 AS AMENDED 14 MARCH 1981. 19 MARCH 1983 AND 07 MARCH 1987
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE REGISTERED BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS OR THOSE HANDICAPPED BY TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED MATERIAL.
Area of benefit
HASTINGS-ST LEONARDS-BALLTE-RYE-AND IMMEDIATE ADJACENT AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window