Financial history Aruna and Ambika Paul Foundation

Charity number: 276127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £332.15k £242.24k £233.12k £306.70k £2.60m
Total expenditure £4.01m £35.13k £1.07m £141.41k £4.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.26m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £336.37k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.74k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £14.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.68m
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £12.74k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0