WELSH CORGI RESCUE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The welfare of dogs more particularly the Welsh Corgi Pembroke and Cardigan, and the re homing of Corgi's when the owners can no longer keep them or if they have been abandoned. Research into canine Degenerative Mylopetha, which causes the gradual loss of function of the hind legs due to pressure on the spinal column.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 July 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANLEY CHANDLER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Diana King | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Byde | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Hill | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Baites | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Davies | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Richards | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Creech | Trustee | 20 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MISS CHRIS TITCHEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.35k | £41.03k | £82.28k | £242.85k | £69.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.17k | £28.28k | £55.24k | £49.86k | £50.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 29 JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
TO ALLEVIATE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS CAUSED TO DOGS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE BREED KNOWN AS WELSH CORGIS, WHO MAY BE ILL-TREATED, ABANDONED OR NEGLECTED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Havilands
East Nynehead
WELLINGTON
TA21 0DA
- Phone:
- 01823461699
- Email:
- welshcorgirescue@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window