THE ROSE ROAD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Services for young disabled people and their families including: Oaks and Acorns Residential Short breaks Service children and adults Outreach Community Services Activities in schools and community Parent advice independent support information and empowerment through Family Services Specialist sensory, Hydrotherapy and Soft Play facilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Hampshire
  • Poole
  • Portsmouth City
  • Southampton City
  • West Berkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 July 1970: Standard registration
  • 09 September 2022: Funds received from 1162049 HAMPSHIRE PARENT CARER NETWORK
  • 24 August 2023: Funds received from 1173305 ADHARA AUTISM TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ROSE ROAD (Working name)
  • SOUTHAMPTON AND DISTRICT SPASTICS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Gomer Chair 29 October 2019
ROMSEY DIVISION GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Karen Elizabeth Rankine Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Sarah Gail Pease Trustee 25 February 2025
None on record
Emma Hurst Trustee 02 April 2024
None on record
Anne Provan Trustee 29 March 2022
None on record
Christopher David Sirl Trustee 07 December 2021
None on record
Samantha Clough Trustee 29 October 2019
None on record
JANE LYON MARIS Trustee 30 November 2012
None on record
CON ATTRIDGE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.85m £4.05m £3.77m £5.10m £4.72m
Total expenditure £3.58m £3.57m £3.81m £4.30m £4.98m
Income from government contracts £2.56m £2.85m £2.66m £3.11m £3.74m
Income from government grants £693.06k £571.22k £586.32k £459.02k £403.80k
Income - Donations and legacies £346.60k £377.22k £319.92k £1.31m £384.15k
Income - Other trading activities £102.88k £64.64k £80.10k £15.06k £17.57k
Income - Charitable activities £3.40m £3.60m £3.37m £3.66m £4.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £1.00m £0
Income - Investment £1.36k £836 £1.07k £13.30k £43.88k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £99.82k £108.05k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.27m £3.31m £3.52m £4.03m £4.71m
Expenditure - Raising funds £191.26k £154.50k £292.49k £220.91k £236.97k
Expenditure - Governance £32.89k £33.57k £0 £30.58k £31.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £586.32k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £123.01k £101.37k £0 £49.59k £42.05k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £2.61m £2.64m £2.60m £2.58m £2.68m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.60m £2.03m £2.03m £2.74m £2.66m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £511.04k £488.37k £491.92k £386.21k £656.87k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 06 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ROSE ROAD ASSOCIATION
300 ALDERMOOR ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 5NA
Phone:
02380 721234