INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF RADIOGRAPHERS AND RADIOLOGICAL TECHNOLOGISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides workshops and education for in health matters and radiation protection where requested throughout the world. Co-operates with United Nations, World Health Organisation and the International Atomic Agency Agency. Organises conferences related to topics in radiography, radiology and ultrasound. Provides grants for relevant research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belgium
- Benin
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Cameroon
- Canada
- China
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Estonia
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kenya
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turkey
- Uganda
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 24 January 1980: Standard registration
- ISRRT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Donna Long | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Lacey | Trustee | 18 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Efthimios Tim Agadakos | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hakon Hjemly | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alain Cromp | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Yudthaphon Vichianin | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tan Chek Wee | Trustee | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPE GERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR NAPAPONG PONGNAPANG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.34k | £80.36k | £81.63k | £124.85k | £88.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.10k | £59.24k | £78.60k | £143.49k | £97.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
25 November 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
15 November 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 December 2020 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 December 2020 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND REGULATIONS ADOPTED 1969 AND AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 1977, 25 OCTOBER 1979, 5 JULY 1992, 24/25 MARCH 1997 AND 28 APRIL 2001; AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 1 FEBRUARY 2005; AMENDED 11 DECEMBER 2007; AMENDED 15 APRIL 2008. AS AMENDED ON 19 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF RADIOGRAPHY, RADIOTHERAPY AND ALLIED SUBJECTS BY THE PROMOTION OF IMPROVED STANDARDS OF EDUCATION AND OF RESEARCH IN THE TECHNICAL ASPECTS OF RADIATION, MEDICINE AND PROTECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kalavriton 10
Moschato attiki
- Phone:
- 00447541751335
- Email:
- ceo@isrrt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window