Trustees THE DOMINICA (UK) ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 276254

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Michael John | Chair | 03 April 2013 |
|
|||||
Heather Magdalene Charles | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hulda Deborah Williams | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Brenda Delsol | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Jennifer Vidal | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rianna Evelyn Patterson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ingrid Grant | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Jaurice Peter | Trustee | 24 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
REGINALD JOHNSON | Trustee | 31 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.