THE CHELSEA SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
lectures and meetings to protect and foster the amenities of Chelsea
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 30 July 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Thompson | Chair | 13 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Chris Lenon | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Amalia Carmen Cebreiro | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Lever | Trustee | 23 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Jane Ingham | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Stephen | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL ERNEST BACH | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||||
MARTYN MURRAY BAKER | Trustee | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.37k | £24.27k | £39.38k | £30.35k | £46.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.31k | £19.18k | £24.47k | £27.78k | £32.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 13 July 2023 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH NOVEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND IMPROVE THE AMENITIES OF CHELSEA.
Area of benefit
CHELSEA
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Paradise Walk
LONDON
SW3 4JL
- Phone:
- 02073522035
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window