RICHMOND SHAKESPEARE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Richmond Shakespeare Society is a local amateur theatre group, a member of the Little Theatre Guild of Great Britain. We operate two professionally run Youth Theatres covering the age groups 8-19 and run from our own premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 24 August 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Medawar | Chair | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Arashveen O'Keeffe | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Pyle | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Bentley | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Warren | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Messum | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Horobin | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sasha Gascoine | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles James Phillips | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Figaro | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eugene Allan Hertzman | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marc Pearce | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Bartlett | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Francis Abbott | Trustee | 09 October 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £231.68k | £44.59k | £527.70k | £125.09k | £131.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.83k | £49.85k | £86.41k | £136.73k | £137.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.50k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £457.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £69.21k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £548 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £364 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £440.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £81.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £1.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £3.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £3.42k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 24/05/1978 AS AMENDED ON 06/07/1987 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 05/10/2010 AS AMENDED ON 07/10/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC OF THE WORKS OF SHAKESPEARE IN PARTICULAR AND POETRY GENERALLY WITHIN THE AREA OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES.
Area of benefit
RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARY WALLACE THEATRE
THE EMBANKMENT
TWICKENHAM
TW1 3DU
- Phone:
- 02087440547
- Email:
- secretary@rss-mwt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window