THE ANCIENT INDIA AND IRAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aims to advance knowledge of the Indo-Iranian languages and their history and of the early cultures of the Indian and Iranian worlds. It maintains a library which is open to the public, organizes lectures, seminars and exhibitions, and gives grants for travel and research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 1978: Standard registration
- 18 November 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 November 2016: Funds transferred to 1162982 THE ANCIENT INDIA AND IRAN TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.48k | £114.30k | £115.23k | £192.84k | £102.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.84k | £101.95k | £84.43k | £110.46k | £100.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 18 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 18 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 17 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 17 October 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 18 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 18 November 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH JULY 1978 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 17 JULY 1994.
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE DUFFUSION AND KNOWLEDGE CONCERNING THE INDO-IRANIAN LANGUAGES AND THEIR HISTORY AND THE EARLY CULTURES OF THE INDIAN AND IRANIAN WORLD PARTICULARLY AS THEY ARE REPRESENTED IN THE PRE-HISTORY ARCHAEOLOGY ART HISTORY AND ANCIENT HISTORY OF THE REGIONS CONCERNED NAMELY THE INDIAN SUB-CONTINENT (COMPRISING THE MODERN STATES OF INDIA, PAKISTAN, SRI LANKA, NEPAL AND BANGLADESH) IRAN, AFGHANISTAN, CENTRAL ASIA (COMPRISING THE TADJUIK, TURKMIN, UZBEK AND KIRGHIZ SOVIET REPUBLICS AND CHINESE TURKESTAN) AND SOUTH-EAST ASIA (PRIMARILY IN RESPECT OF THOSE PERIODS AND REGIONS IN WHICH DIRECT INDIAN CONTACTS ARE IN EVIDENCE).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window