Governing document TRUSTEE SAVINGS BANKS STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 10/04/1986 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 27/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/04/2015 as amended on 09 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
2.1 TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS THE FOLLOWING CLASSES OF PERSONS BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS FROM MONIES RAISED BY DONATIONS, SUBSCRIPTIONS, LEGACIES AND INTEREST ON CAPITAL DERIVED THERE FROM: 2.1.1.1 MEMBERS AND RETIRED MEMBERS OF THE STAFFS OF THE HISTORIC TRUSTEE SAVINGS BANKS, SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES AND OTHER APPROVED ORGANISATIONS. 2.1.1.2 DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF. 2.1.1.3 DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF. 2.1.1.4 PERSONS MAINTAINED BY DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF AT THE DATE OF THEIR DEATH. 2.1.2.1 MEMBERS AND RETIRED MEMBERS OF THE STAFFS OF THE TSB BANK PLC, ASSOCIATED COMPANIES AND OTHER APPROVED ORGANISATIONS. 2.1.2.2 DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF. 2.1.2.3 DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF. 2.1.2.4 PERSONS MAINTAINED BY DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF AT THE DATE OF THEIR DEATH. 2.1.3.1 INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF A TSB BANK PLC SPONSORED PENSION SCHEME. 2.1.3.2 DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF. 2.1.3.3 DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF. 2.1.3.4 PERSONS MAINTAINED BY DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF AT THE DATE OF THEIR DEATH. 2.1.4.1 MEMBERS AND RETIRED MEMBERS OF THE STAFF OF LLOYDS BANKING GROUP PLC, SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES AND OTHER APPROVED ORGANISATIONS. 2.1.4.2 DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF. 2.1.4.3 DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF. 2.1.4.4 PERSONS MAINTAINED BY DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH STAFF AT THE DATE OF THEIR DEATH. 2.1.5.1 INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF LLOYDS TSB PENSION SCHEME NO. 1 AND LLOYDS TSB PENSION SCHEME NO. 2. 2.1.5.2 DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF. 2.1.5.3 DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF. 2.1.5.4 PERSONS MAINTAINED BY DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF AT THE DATE OF THEIR DEATH. 2.1.6.1 INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF LLOYDS BANKING GROUP YOUR TOMORROW SCHEMES. 2.1.6.2 DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF. 2.1.6.3 DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF. 2.1.6.4 PERSONS MAINTAINED BY DECEASED MEMBERS OF SUCH RETIRED STAFF AT THE DATE OF THEIR DEATH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.