WELLS OPERATIC SOCIETY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve and advance education by the production of educational plays and the encouragement of the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 08 November 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Annalisa Checchi | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Amy Hutton | Trustee | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Marshall | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Orman | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Watts | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Hardy | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Munckton | Trustee | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Sarah Hoare | Trustee | 19 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jayne Hope | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roberta Ellen Bass | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Edward Creswick | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Hartley Scammell | Trustee | 22 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Scammell | Trustee | 18 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Perrin | Trustee | 20 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.68k | £54.50k | £69.15k | £59.88k | £87.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.13k | £38.57k | £49.16k | £64.68k | £83.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £25.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7TH JULY 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION PARICULARLY BY THE PRODUCTION OF EDUCATIONAL PLAYS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA BALLET MUSIC SINGING LITERATURE SCULPTURE AND PAINTING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wells Operatic Society
The Little Theatre
Chamberlain Street
WELLS
BA5 2PS
- Phone:
- 01749672280
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window