THE BALFOUR DIAMOND JUBILEE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the education of the public in the history of the relations between Israel and the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Israel
Governance
- 11 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKIE GRYN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR HENRY STRAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH JULY 1978
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE RELATIONS BETWEEN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL AND IN PARTICULAR TO THE EVENTS LEADING TO THE BALFOUR DECLARATION IN 1917 THE HISTORY OF AND EXISTING REALATIONS BETWEEN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH THE THEORY AND DOCRTINE OF ZIONISM AND THE EVENTS LEADING TO THE ESTABLISHMENT OF THE STATE OF ISRAEL AND THE INVOLVEMENT THEREIN OF THE GOVERNMENT OF GREAT BRITAIN AND THE PRESENT RELATIONS BETWEEN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ISRAEL AND EACH AND EVERY ASPECT THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 ADDISON ROAD
LONDON
W14 8JL
- Phone:
- 02076035847
- Email:
- strage@me.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window