SHRI PARAMHANS ADVAIT MAT - UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle objective of the temple is to advance religion by spreading and preaching the spiritual teachings of Parmhans Shri Shri 108 Shri Swami Advait Anandji Maharaj ji Sanyasi.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 August 1978: Standard registration
- SHRI PARAMHANS ADVAIT MAT-UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEVKANT RUSTAGI | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
NARINDERPAL SINGH RAIKHY | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAJNEESH Mehra | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GIRISH CHANDRA CHOPRA | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANANT YOGANAND MAHATMA | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEMANT BABBAR | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ATAM PARAM ANAND | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SATINDER KISHORE GULHATI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VINOD KUMAR MEHRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHATMA SHABD PREM ANAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAM SARUP NANGLA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.44k | £119.85k | £102.84k | £114.63k | £137.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.11k | £47.32k | £55.40k | £99.60k | £78.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 23RD JULY 1978 as amended on 07 Nov 2020 as amended on 12 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS OF SHRI SWAMI ADVAIT ANAND JI MAHARAJ JI SANYASI, UNIVERSALLY KNOWN AS SHRI PARAMHANS ADVAIT MAT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
41-43 BRONDESBURY PARK
LONDON
NW6 7AY
- Phone:
- 02084593281
- Email:
- ssdnlondon@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window