Trustees SHRI PARAMHANS ADVAIT MAT - UK
Charity number: 276370

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEVKANT RUSTAGI | Trustee | 26 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
NARINDERPAL SINGH RAIKHY | Trustee | 24 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
RAJNEESH Mehra | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GIRISH CHANDRA CHOPRA | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANANT YOGANAND MAHATMA | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
HEMANT BABBAR | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ATAM PARAM ANAND | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
SATINDER KISHORE GULHATI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VINOD KUMAR MEHRA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHATMA SHABD PREM ANAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAM SARUP NANGLA | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.