THE ALBA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further both in the United Kingdom and abroad those purposes recognised as charitable in English Law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS RITA GLATT | Trustee |
|
||||||
LESLIE GLATT | Trustee |
|
||||||
DEBORAH KESTEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.80k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.36k | £8.39k | £3.85k | £33.11k | £47.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH JULY 1978
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES (MEANING PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW FOR THE TIME BEING OF ENGLAND) AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 GOODYERS GARDENS
LONDON
NW4 2HD
- Phone:
- 02074343494
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window