Enable Ability

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide care, welfare, interest and advancement of disabled people and their families and carers in the locality. To respond to the needs of the above people. Enable Ability has the general aims of contributing to the quality of life of disabled people and those related to them in the greater Portsmouth area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,449,034
Donations and legacies | £105.41k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £47.33k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,441,770
Raising funds | £10.00k | |
Charitable activities | £1.43m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,260 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £829,355 from 2 government contract(s) and £31,223 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.43m | |
Retained for future use | £7.26k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.43m | |
Retained for future use | £9.52k |
People

78 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- Enable Ability (Working name)
- ENABLEABILITY (Previous name)
- PORTSMOUTH AND DISTRICT CEREBRAL PALSY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- PORTSMOUTH AND DISTRICT SPASTICS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE CP CENTRE (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JON ROBERT MULLER | Chair | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Alan Bowie | Trustee | 19 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andy Osborn | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robertson | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sue Coldham | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Alun Thomas | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Marie Blomerus | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Catherine Bowie | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
William Michael John | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Drew Ramsay | Trustee | 04 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
STUART ELSOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18m | £892.10k | £991.55k | £1.79m | £1.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08m | £1.01m | £1.06m | £1.28m | £1.44m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £829.36k | |
|
Income from government grants | £593.24k | £298.78k | £533.42k | £707.81k | £31.22k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £80.34k | £27.60k | £32.48k | £502.51k | £105.41k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £230.49k | £36.59k | £85.63k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £824.02k | £790.56k | £830.59k | £1.24m | £1.30m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £45.76k | £37.34k | £42.85k | £41.06k | £47.33k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £7.19k | £10.00k | £84.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.08m | £1.01m | £1.06m | £1.27m | £1.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £12.10k | £10.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.00k | £3.50k | £3.50k | £4.63k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £146.97k | £148.76k | £145.43k | £620.23k | £612.78k | |
|
Long-term investments | £38.05k | £155.76k | £162.76k | £57.33k | £59.59k | |
|
Other assets | £488.56k | £430.03k | £255.34k | £412.23k | £413.74k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.27k | £134.47k | £25.51k | £47.34k | £34.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH DECEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 OCTOBER 1988, 14 NOVEMBER 1991, 8 OCTOBER 2001 AND 8 MARCH 2007 as amended on 14 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE CARE, WELFARE, INTEREST AND ADVANCEMENT OF PEOPLE WITH CEREBRAL PALSY AND OTHER DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE FORMER PORTSMOUTH AND SOUTH EAST HAMPSHIRE HEALTH AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH AND SOUTH EAST HAMPSHIRE WHICH COVERS EMSWORTH, FAREHAM, GOSPORT, HAVANT, HAYLING ISLAND AND PETERSFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ENABLE ABILITY
311-313 COPNOR ROAD
PORTSMOUTH
PO3 5EG
- Phone:
- 02392671846
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window