Trustees SPIRITUAL ASSEMBLY OF THE BAHA'IS OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE
Charity number: 276434

Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary Jane Watson | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rezvan Habibi | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diba Missaghi | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saghar Saberian Modarres | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mansoor Foroughi | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shirin Salmanpour | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MONA HAJATDOOST SANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAMEZ SALMANPOUR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AFSHIN TARAZ | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.