Trustees THE ENFIELD SOCIETY
Charity number: 276451

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID COCKLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alec Derrick Tyler | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Osborne Parker | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Avril Nanton | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Cole | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jan Mary Metcalfe | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tony Foster | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Francis Lack | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Christine Morris | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PETER VAUGHAN WEST | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STONES | Trustee | 12 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
BOB FOWLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART DAVID EDMUND MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.