THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 276457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support all activities commensurate with the museum's ongoing aims and objectives in particular recognising the past service of those who served in the regiment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £1,165
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • Gloucestershire
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 October 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GLOSTERS MUSEUM (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Leslie Stilwell Chair 30 September 2017
None on record
Brigadier Gary Andrew McDade Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Jason Jordan Esq Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Ian Michael Savage MA Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Michael Motum Trustee 21 August 2018
THE SOUTH WEST HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RIFLES AND LIGHT INFANTRY ASSOCIATION, SOMERSET
Received: On time
THE SOMERSET MILITARY MUSEUM TRUST
Received: On time
THE VILLAGE HALL (SHAPWICK)
Received: On time
Robert Hunter Morris Trustee 01 October 2013
None on record
GUY EDWARD CHRISTOPHER WOODCOCK Trustee
THE SOLDIERS OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE MUSEUM
Received: On time
COLONEL STEPHEN JAMES OXLADE MBE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £564 £343 £76 £45.46k £1.17k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £15 £1.23k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 March 2022 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Rifles Taunton Office
14 Mount Street
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 3QB
Phone:
01823 333434
Website:

No information available