MISS P M MAJOR CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a traditional grant-making trust originally established by a private individual. Grants are made to organisations - not individuals - for general charitable purposes. The Trustees follow a proactive system of making grants/donations. Accordingly applications from other charities/the public are not encouraged and will not be acknowledged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN MILES BAKER | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MARTIN CLARK | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
NONA CATHARINE BAKER | Trustee |
|
||||||
CHARLES ANTONY HICKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.26k | £6.85k | £7.50k | £8.31k | £9.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.17k | £3.07k | £13.85k | £7.92k | £12.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH AUGUST 1978
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OR CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND OR ANY PART OF PARTS THEREOF FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE OF THE CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR OBJECTS SPECIFIED IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AND GENERALLY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIDDLESFOLD MANOR FARMHOUSE
NORTHCHAPEL
PETWORTH
GU28 9EN
- Phone:
- 01428 708108
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window